NY A00307 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - print number 307b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - print number 307b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the coverage period for medical assistance to a period of one year beginning on the last day of pregnancy.
Title
Extends the coverage period for medical assistance to a period of one year beginning on the last day of pregnancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Assembly | print number 307b |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | print number 307a |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01411 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES