NY A00326 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-9)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - substituted by s5739a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - substituted by s5739a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the crime of unauthorized radio transmission; prohibits knowingly making a radio transmission on radio frequencies assigned and licensed by the federal communications commission for use by AM and FM radio stations.
Title
Creates the crime of unauthorized radio transmission; prohibits knowingly making a radio transmission on radio frequencies assigned and licensed by the federal communications commission for use by AM and FM radio stations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5739a |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.513 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | print number 326b |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | print number 326a |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |