NY A00364 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the New York city commissioner of finance to approve suitable rewards for information that leads to the detection of violations of the tax on cigarettes.
Title
Authorizes the New York city commissioner of finance to approve suitable rewards for information that leads to the detection of violations of the tax on cigarettes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.526 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1397 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6349 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.26 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.200 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.200 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06349 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A364