NY A00435 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the power authority of the state of New York to file a report annually commencing March 31, 2022 with the governor, the comptroller, the chair of the assembly ways and means and the senate finance committees, respectively, and the authority budget office, on its operations and transactions, complying with the uniform system of accounts required for electric corporations pursuant to the public service law.
Title
Requires the power authority of the state of New York to file a report annually commencing March 31, 2022 with the governor, the comptroller, the chair of the assembly ways and means and the senate finance committees, respectively, and the authority budget office, on its operations and transactions, complying with the uniform system of accounts required for electric corporations pursuant to the public service law.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] |
Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-13 | Senate | vetoed memo.196 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1154 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1873 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.48 |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01873 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - tabled