NY A00458 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the use of the ballot in New York city for primary elections.
Title
Clarifies the use of the ballot in New York city for primary elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.45 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.45 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to election law |