NY A00463 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - approval memo.61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - approval memo.61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires written notice of an adverse determination made by a utilization review agent in relation to a step therapy protocol override determination.
Title
Requires written notice of an adverse determination made by a utilization review agent in relation to a step therapy protocol override determination.
Sponsors
Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
Asm. Keith Brown [R] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Scott Bendett [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.61 |
2023-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.735 |
2023-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1179 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2677A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.483 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.483 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 463a |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02677 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A463A