NY A00481 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-19 - approval memo.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-19 - approval memo.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to transparency in health insurance claims data for public employers participating in the New York state health insurance program.
Title
Relates to transparency in health insurance claims data for public employers participating in the New York state health insurance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Senate | approval memo.10 |
2013-12-18 | Senate | signed chap.547 |
2013-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.221 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3788 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.288 |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03788 (Same As) 2013-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A481