NY A00488 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - print number 488b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - print number 488b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a licensed dental hygienist, collaborative practice (RDH-CP) to provide services without supervision in collaboration with a licensed dentist under a collaborative practice agreement.
Title
Authorizes a licensed dental hygienist, collaborative practice (RDH-CP) to provide services without supervision in collaboration with a licensed dentist under a collaborative practice agreement.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Assembly | print number 488b |
2024-03-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | print number 488a |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08759 (Same As) 2024-03-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8759A