NY A00589 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to gambling and the creation of a self-exclusion request for removal form.
Title
Relates to gambling and the creation of a self-exclusion request for removal form.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 589a |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S08771 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S08811 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
S08811 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES