NY A00589 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division of housing and community renewal to publish on its website a database of building-wide major capital improvements installed by landlords in every city of more than one million inhabitants.
Title
Requires the division of housing and community renewal to publish on its website a database of building-wide major capital improvements installed by landlords in every city of more than one million inhabitants.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] |
Asm. Latrice Walker [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | print number 589a |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S02363 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT