NY A00639 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - print number 639a
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - print number 639a
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a tax abatement for electric energy storage equipment placed in service after January 1, 2026 and before January 1, 2028.
Title
Provides for a tax abatement for electric energy storage equipment placed in service after January 1, 2026 and before January 1, 2028.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Assembly | print number 639a |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07342 (Same As) 2024-04-03 - referred to real property taxation