NY A00670 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - advanced to third reading cal.455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - advanced to third reading cal.455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to medical parole and determinations of whether a person released on medical parole is physically or cognitively incapable of presenting a danger to society.
Title
Relates to medical parole and determinations of whether a person released on medical parole is physically or cognitively incapable of presenting a danger to society.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.455 |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.396 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to correction |