NY A00710 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacture, distribution and sale of nail polish and nail hardener containing certain dibutyl phthalates (DBP), toluene, or formaldehyde; prohibits the use of such nail polish and nail hardener by appearance enhancement businesses.
Title
Prohibits the manufacture, distribution and sale of nail polish and nail hardener containing certain dibutyl phthalates (DBP), toluene, or formaldehyde; prohibits the use of such nail polish and nail hardener by appearance enhancement businesses.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Joan Millman [D] | Asm. Micah Kellner [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] |
Asm. Nily Rozic [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Annette Robinson [D] | Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to economic development |