NY A00762 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-01 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-01 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To protect the health, safety and welfare of pre-school and nursery school children during transport.
Title
An act to amend the vehicle and traffic law, in relation to expanding the definition of bus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | |
2010-02-01 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-01 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.66 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-05-18 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-05-18 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-18 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-14 | advanced to third reading cal.552 | |
2009-05-12 | reported | |
2009-04-28 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-01-07 | referred to transportation |