NY A00784 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an affirmation of a health care practitioner may be served or filed in an action in lieu of and with same force and effect as an affidavit (changes the current reference in existing provisions from "physician, osteopath or dentist" to "health care practitioner").
Title
Provides that an affirmation of a health care practitioner may be served or filed in an action in lieu of and with same force and effect as an affidavit (changes the current reference in existing provisions from "physician, osteopath or dentist" to "health care practitioner").
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | print number 784a |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00877 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - referred to codes