NY A00856 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits employers from requiring certain conditions or preconditions of employment.
Title
Prohibits employers from requiring certain conditions or preconditions of employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.29 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.126 |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03258 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING