NY A00903 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - substituted by s355
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - substituted by s355
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of drilling fluids, brine and flowback water from wells, pools or fields on any highway for any purpose including but not limited to de-icing or dust suppression.
Title
Prohibits the use of drilling fluids, brine and flowback water from wells, pools or fields on any highway for any purpose including but not limited to de-icing or dust suppression.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Assembly | substituted by s355 |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.161 |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00355 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.64