NY A00969 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-11 - print number 969a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-11 - print number 969a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospitals, nursing homes and community health clinics to provide patient documents in large print format, language and hearing assistance services and audio recordings of pertinent medical information.
Title
Requires hospitals, nursing homes and community health clinics to provide patient documents in large print format, language and hearing assistance services and audio recordings of pertinent medical information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-11 | Assembly | print number 969a |
2012-01-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-05-25 | Assembly | starred on calendar |
2011-01-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.24 |
2011-01-25 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |