NY A00969 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the amount of damages recoverable in a cause of action for unlawful interference with protected rights which is up to three times the amount of compensatory damages.
Title
Relates to the amount of damages recoverable in a cause of action for unlawful interference with protected rights which is up to three times the amount of compensatory damages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Assembly | signed chap.26 |
2023-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-02-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.288 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2235 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.42 |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.42 |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-18 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02235 (Same As) 2023-02-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A969