NY A00986 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the restoration of electric power services during a widespread outage; requires electric corporations and the Long Island power authority service provider during a widespread prolonged outage that affects at least twenty thousand customers to notify the village, town or city if certain electric power services are not able to be restored; requires the chief executive to coordinate with affected police departments, fire departments, ambulance services and advanced life support first response services prewired with an appropriate transfer switch for using an alternate generated power source for the emergency deployment of alternate generated power sources.
Title
Relates to the restoration of electric power services during a widespread outage; requires electric corporations and the Long Island power authority service provider during a widespread prolonged outage that affects at least twenty thousand customers to notify the village, town or city if certain electric power services are not able to be restored; requires the chief executive to coordinate with affected police departments, fire departments, ambulance services and advanced life support first response services prewired with an appropriate transfer switch for using an alternate generated power source for the emergency deployment of alternate generated power sources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Assembly | signed chap.37 |
2023-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-02-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.161 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2224 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.12 |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.12 |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02224 (Same As) 2023-02-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A986