NY A01056 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - amended on third reading (t) 1056a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - amended on third reading (t) 1056a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the date for the accrual of certain causes of action based on negligence.
Title
Establishes the date for the accrual of certain causes of action based on negligence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 1056a |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.552 |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.494 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.494 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00744 (Same As) 2013-01-09 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
S07130 (Same As) 2014-04-30 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
S07130 (Same As) 2014-04-30 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY