NY A01090 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - print number 1090a
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - print number 1090a
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the release of certain records pertaining to deceased residents of the office for people with developmental disabilities operated or certified facilities to family members.
Title
Authorizes the release of certain records pertaining to deceased residents of the office for people with developmental disabilities operated or certified facilities to family members.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Assembly | print number 1090a |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S03636 (Same As) 2016-02-02 - referred to mental health