NY A01125 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - amended on third reading 1125a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Defines a serious condition regarding the medical use of marihuana as a condition, or symptom or complication of the condition or its treatment, for which, in the practitioner's professional opinion and review of past treatments, the patient is likely to receive therapeutic or palliative benefit from primary or adjunctive treatment with medical use of medical marihuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defines a serious condition regarding the medical use of marihuana as a condition, or symptom or complication of the condition or its treatment, for which, in the practitioner's professional opinion and review of past treatments, the patient is likely to receive therapeutic or palliative benefit from primary or adjunctive treatment with medical use of medical marihuana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11Assemblyamended on third reading 1125a
2019-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.100
2019-03-05Assemblyreported
2019-01-29Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S02058 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback