NY A01177 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - print number 1177a
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - print number 1177a
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the availability of adult day care programs in counties with a population of 1,332,650 and less than 1,334,544.
Title
Relates to increasing the availability of adult day care programs in counties with a population of 1,332,650 and less than 1,334,544.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Assembly | print number 1177a |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S00117 (Same As) 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 117A