NY A01190 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Updates certain requirements regarding billing for electric services, such as when corporations shall use an approved demand measuring device, mandating that classifications of service, the account and/or meter number, and the quantity billed be indicated on customers' bills.
Title
Updates certain requirements regarding billing for electric services, such as when corporations shall use an approved demand measuring device, mandating that classifications of service, the account and/or meter number, and the quantity billed be indicated on customers' bills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Assembly | tabled |
2023-11-17 | Assembly | vetoed memo.38 |
2023-11-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-05-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.125 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S334 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.100 |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-13 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S00334 (Same As) 2023-05-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1190