NY A01319 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the urban and regional farmers' markets facilities construction program; defines related terms and regulates grants and financing; establishes revolving loan and loan guarantee fund.
Title
Establishes the urban and regional farmers' markets facilities construction program; defines related terms and regulates grants and financing; establishes revolving loan and loan guarantee fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-05-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04019 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS