NY A01322 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit any permits for oil or gas drilling to be issued by DEC for two years. Furthermore the bill would permanently prohibit any such drilling within ten miles of the New York City watershed or water supply infrastructure; or any other water system that has received a filtration avoidance determination from the US EPA. No drilling would be allowed in any area overlying a sole source aqui- fer; any other area that DEC identifies for protection of drinking water; critical habitats for threatened or endangered species or a "natural heritage area as defined by law; any other area identified by the DEC as a bird conservation area or critical bird habitat; flood- plains; or all areas with NYS park, forest preserve, state forest, wild- life refuge, wildlife management area or wilderness area. The DEC would determine by regulation how much of a buffer would be placed around these areas. Furthermore, a municipality, as requested by either the chief executive or legislative body, has the right to apply to the DEC to study the need for a ban within its borders.
Title
Establishes a moratorium on the issuance of permits for the drilling of wells and prohibits drilling within ten miles of the New York city water supply infrastructure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-03 | print number 1322c | |
2010-05-03 | amend and recommit to environmental conservation | |
2010-01-29 | print number 1322b | |
2010-01-29 | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation | |
2010-01-19 | print number 1322a | |
2010-01-19 | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation | |
2010-01-06 | referred to environmental conservation | |
2009-01-07 | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S6654-A (Same As) 2010-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 6654B