NY A01396 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes treatment of workers' compensation injuries by an occupational therapy assistant.
Title
Authorizes treatment of workers' compensation injuries by an occupational therapy assistant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.102 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.320 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.320 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 1396b |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | print number 1396a |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05153 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
S08743 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S08743 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN