NY A01436 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to reporting of youth placed in foster care settings and recruitment of foster parents; requires information including the total number of youth placed in foster care, the reasons why such youth were placed and the efforts the state has taken to recruit and retain foster parents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to reporting of youth placed in foster care settings and recruitment of foster parents; requires information including the total number of youth placed in foster care, the reasons why such youth were placed and the efforts the state has taken to recruit and retain foster parents.

Sponsors

Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]
Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]
Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]
Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]
Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]
Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]
Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]
Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]
Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]
Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]
Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Jamie Romeo [D]
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Taylor Darling [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]
Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]
Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]

Roll Calls

2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-22Senate3RD READING CAL.870
2020-07-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S222C
2020-07-22SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-22Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.221
2020-07-21Assemblyrules report cal.221
2020-07-21Assemblyreported
2020-07-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2020-03-06Assemblyprint number 1436c
2020-03-06Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to children and families
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to children and families
2019-05-10Assemblyprint number 1436b
2019-05-10Assemblyamend and recommit to children and families
2019-04-03Assemblyprint number 1436a
2019-04-03Assemblyamend and recommit to children and families
2019-01-15Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S00222 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1436C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1436
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01436&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01436
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01436&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01436A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01436&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01436B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01436&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01436C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01436&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01436&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01436&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01436&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1436#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback