NY A01465 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes retail licenses to sell liquor for on-premises consumption at airline lounges located within an airport and owned, leased, or operated by a United States certified airline.
Title
Authorizes retail licenses to sell liquor for on-premises consumption at airline lounges located within an airport and owned, leased, or operated by a United States certified airline.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | print number 1465a |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04352 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING