NY A01477 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - substituted by s490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - substituted by s490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the maintenance of abandoned cemeteries; authorizes a solvent not-for-profit cemetery corporation that merges with an abandoned cemetery in a city to apply for state funds for the maintenance of an abandoned cemetery.
Title
Relates to the maintenance of abandoned cemeteries; authorizes a solvent not-for-profit cemetery corporation that merges with an abandoned cemetery in a city to apply for state funds for the maintenance of an abandoned cemetery.
Sponsors
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. William Magnarelli [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Assembly | substituted by s490 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.140 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S00490 (Same As) 2023-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.74