NY A01483 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the operation of NYC transit authority subways or trains without at least one conductor on board; requires a conductor on any subway or train operated by such authority whenever the subway or train has more than two cars attached to the engine.
Title
Prohibits the operation of NYC transit authority subways or trains without at least one conductor on board; requires a conductor on any subway or train operated by such authority whenever the subway or train has more than two cars attached to the engine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05214 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE