NY A01539 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of a self-sufficiency standard study regarding how much income is needed for a family of a given composition in a given geographic location to adequately meet its basic needs without public or private assistance.
Title
Relates to the creation of a self-sufficiency standard study regarding how much income is needed for a family of a given composition in a given geographic location to adequately meet its basic needs without public or private assistance.
Sponsors
Asm. Latoya Joyner [D] | Asm. George Alvarez [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] |
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | print number 1539a |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S02143 (Same As) 2024-03-26 - referred to ways and means