NY A01548 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an LGBT youth and young adult suicide prevention task force; provides for the number of members, manner of appointment and the topics to be reviewed.
Title
Establishes an LGBT youth and young adult suicide prevention task force; provides for the number of members, manner of appointment and the topics to be reviewed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | print number 1548a |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S03083 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - referred to mental health