NY A01599 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits special proceedings against certain designated state officials to be commenced in a supreme court in the judicial district of the petitioner's residence or principal place of business; provides that a proceeding against the public service commission shall only be commenced in the supreme court, Albany county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits special proceedings against certain designated state officials to be commenced in a supreme court in the judicial district of the petitioner's residence or principal place of business; provides that a proceeding against the public service commission shall only be commenced in the supreme court, Albany county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatetabled
2018-12-07Senatevetoed memo.270
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.1566
2018-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7086
2018-05-15SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2018-05-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-15Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-10Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.858
2018-05-08Assemblyreported
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to codes
2017-01-12Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S00488 (Same As) 2017-01-04 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
S07086 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1599

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback