NY A01617 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - print number 1617b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - print number 1617b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of the bill is to require schools to promulgate an integrated pest management plan approved by the commis- sioner of the department of environmental conservation in consultation with the commissioner of health and education.
Title
Requires integrated pest management plans, as developed or approved by the commissioner of the department of environmental conservation in consultation with the commissioner of education and the commissioner of health, to be implemented in child day care centers, head start day care centers and schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | print number 1617b | |
2010-06-09 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-06-08 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-27 | print number 1617a | |
2010-01-27 | amend and recommit to environmental conservation | |
2010-01-06 | referred to environmental conservation | |
2009-06-02 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-07 | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S418-B (Same As) 2010-06-18 - PRINT NUMBER 418C