NY A01680 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the twelve member rural suicide prevention council to examine the causes of rural suicides or attempts and to make recommendations for rural suicide reduction.
Title
Creates the twelve member rural suicide prevention council to examine the causes of rural suicides or attempts and to make recommendations for rural suicide reduction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S03587 (Same As) 2024-04-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3587A