NY A01696 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - print number 1696a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - print number 1696a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain insurance policies and Medicaid to allow patients a one hundred twenty-day window for additional screening for breast cancer, which may include an additional mammogram, when the provider deems such screening is necessary.
Title
Requires certain insurance policies and Medicaid to allow patients a one hundred twenty-day window for additional screening for breast cancer, which may include an additional mammogram, when the provider deems such screening is necessary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Assembly | print number 1696a |
2024-03-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02465 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 2465A