NY A01715 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - print number 1715a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - print number 1715a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the uniformed court officers of the town of Busti, in the county of Chautauqua, as peace officers.
Title
Designates the uniformed court officers of the town of Busti, in the county of Chautauqua, as peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Assembly | print number 1715a |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | committed to codes |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.51 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.872 |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.872 |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01114 (Same As) 2024-04-16 - PRINT NUMBER 1114A