NY A01789 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the director of the division of minority and women's business development to provide for the minority and women-owned business certification of business entities owned by Indian nations or tribes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the director of the division of minority and women's business development to provide for the minority and women-owned business certification of business entities owned by Indian nations or tribes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senatetabled
2018-12-28Senatevetoed memo.328
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2028
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S858
2018-03-12SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-03-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-12Assemblypassed assembly
2018-03-08Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.709
2018-03-06Assemblyreported
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2017-01-13Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S00858 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1789

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback