NY A01815 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits upon the vacancy of an unsold condominium or cooperative dwelling unit, the rental of such unit unless the original offering plan provided for such rental and a majority of the members of the condominium or cooperative agree thereto; generally requires the sale of such units.
Title
Prohibits upon the vacancy of an unsold condominium or cooperative dwelling unit, the rental of such unit unless the original offering plan provided for such rental and a majority of the members of the condominium or cooperative agree thereto; generally requires the sale of such units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.216 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.216 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S02366 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT