NY A01841 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to payments in lieu of taxes; improves how payments in lieu of taxes are collected.
Title
Relates to payments in lieu of taxes; improves how payments in lieu of taxes are collected.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | tabled |
2017-12-18 | Senate | vetoed memo.208 |
2017-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1105 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2122A |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.467 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.467 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | print number 1841a |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S02122 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1841A