NY A01860 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Awards attorney fees and expert witness fees in employment discrimination cases.
Title
Awards attorney fees and expert witness fees in employment discrimination cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2011-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.442 |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-01-12 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |