NY A01864 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of children and family services to post any additional relevant qualifications of child day care providers which are submitted to such office on its website.
Title
Requires the office of children and family services to post any additional relevant qualifications of child day care providers which are submitted to such office on its website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.230 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1379 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S742 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.84 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.296 |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-13 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S00742 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1864