NY A01873 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the development of materials to be provided to new employees relating to student loan repayment information.
Title
Directs the development of materials to be provided to new employees relating to student loan repayment information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | print number 1873a |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S00346 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - referred to banks