NY A01881 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reports of unclaimed amounts of money or other property.
Title
Relates to reports of unclaimed amounts of money or other property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.319 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |