NY A01906 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on December 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.679
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on December 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.679
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fire inspections in public and private schools; requires annual fire safety reports.
Title
Relates to fire inspections in public and private schools; requires annual fire safety reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.679 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.637 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a1906a |
2019-06-20 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1818 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4663B |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4663A |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4663b |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.637 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 1906a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04663 (Same As) 2019-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.679