NY A01910 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires retailers of bicycles with electric assist and lithium ion electric batteries to provide customers with an operating manual.
Title
Requires retailers of bicycles with electric assist and lithium ion electric batteries to provide customers with an operating manual.
Sponsors
Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. Dana Levenberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | print number 1910a |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07503 (Same As) 2024-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 7503A