NY A01922 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of state to conduct a study on the use of legal material in an electronic format that guarantees the authenticity of and access to such legal materials.
Title
Directs the department of state to conduct a study on the use of legal material in an electronic format that guarantees the authenticity of and access to such legal materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.87 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.87 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | print number 1922c |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | print number 1922b |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | print number 1922a |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06136 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 6136B