NY A01960 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - signed chap.498
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - signed chap.498
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of taxation and finance to include a space on the personal income tax return for taxpayers to check off if they wish to contribute to the state library aid program for financial support for public libraries.
Title
Directs the commissioner of taxation and finance to include a space on the personal income tax return for taxpayers to check off if they wish to contribute to the state library aid program for financial support for public libraries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Assembly | signed chap.498 |
2021-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.521 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4670A |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.101 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.101 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | print number 1960a |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04670 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1960A